Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01651
Date Filed2017-08-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning emails sent from the State Department to ten organizations that had criticized Israel's policies pertaining to protections for Israel in the Trade Facilitation and Trade Enforcement Act of 2015. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5074619) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons DOS)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-15Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (sth) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-284RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/21/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/20/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/21/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/21/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-205NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-206ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by October 4, 2017, the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/20/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff