Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePayne v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2017cv03068
Date Filed2017-08-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr
PlaintiffMarcus Sebastian Payne
Case DescriptionMarcus Payne, a disabled veteran, was involved in litigation with the Department of Veterans Affairs and the IRS. He requested information that would normally be available through a subpoena. When the agencies did not provide the records, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Veterans Affairs ("VA")
DefendantUnited States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service ("IRS")
DefendantUnited States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission ("EEOC")
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-151COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Marcus Sebastian Payne; and Summon(s) issued. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 95246.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits - Part 1, # 2 Exhibits - Part 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-152Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney, NDGA. (eop) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-09-053MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-054NOTICE OF CITATION TO SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Marcus Sebastian Payne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 envelope)(jkl) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-075ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to 10/16/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 9/7/17. (jkl) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-07Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marcus Sebastian Payne re 5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (jkl) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-086Return of Service Executed to USA by Marcus Sebastian Payne. (jkl) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff