Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01669
Date Filed2017-08-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted three FOIA requests to the U.S. Secret Service for records concerning visitors' logs for visitors to four agencies within the White House complex that are subject to FOIA �" OMB, Office of Science and Technology Policy, Office of National Drug Control Policy, and the Council on Environmental Quality. In response to Public Citizen's first request, the Secret Service denied access, telling Public Citizen that the records were not agency records subject to FOIA, but instead were presidential records subject to the Presidential Records Act. Public Citizen filed an administrative appeal, arguing that the D.C. Circuit's decision in Judicial Watch v. Secret Service had held that visitors' logs for White House components subject to FOIA were not presidential records. The Secret Service denied Public Citizen's administrative appeal on the basis that the records were presidential records, not agency records. Public Citizen submitted two more requests for the records, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-171COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5078404) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Rule 7.1 Certificate, # 3 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 4 Summons US Attorney Summons, # 5 Summons Secret Service Summons, # 6 Designation of Related Case)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-172MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Rule 65.1 Certificate, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-173NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (md) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-174LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (md) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-17Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (md) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-175SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-176NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Straus Harris on behalf of UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-177NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of All Defendants (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS the Defendant to respond to 2 Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Tuesday, August, 22, 2017. The parties shall appear for a hearing on the motion, if necessary, on Wednesday, August 23, at 11 a.m. in Courtroom 27A. The Court furthers ORDERS that Defendant shall maintain copies of all requested visitor logs pending the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/18/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-21Set/Reset Hearings: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 8/23/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-21MINUTE ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the hearing on Wednesday, August 23, 2017 is vacated. The Court will reschedule the hearing if necessary after reviewing Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/21/2017. (lccrc2) Modified on 8/22/2017 (zlsj). (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-228Memorandum in opposition to re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Declaration of Robert P. Buster, # 3 Declaration of William Willson, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-249REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-2410NOTICE by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE re 8 Memorandum in Opposition, (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-2511Memorandum in opposition to re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Amended) filed by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Declaration of Robert P. Buster, # 3 Declaration (Amended) of William Willson, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-2812REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-2913NOTICE of Appearance by Brad P. Rosenberg on behalf of All Defendants (Rosenberg, Brad) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-09-0614AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC..(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-1515Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 14 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-19MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file its response by October 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/19/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/20/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-10-1216Joint MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-13MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Joint Motion for a 30-Day Stay of Proceedings. The case shall be stayed for 30 days. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court by November 13, 2017 updating the Court on the progress of their discussions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/13/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-11-1317Joint MOTION to Stay (Second) by UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-14MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Joint Motion for a Second Stay. This case shall be stayed for an additional 21 days. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court by December 4, 2017 updating the Court on the progress of their discussions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/14/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2017. Case remains further stayed (lsj) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff