Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTAKALA v. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01715
Date Filed2017-08-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffRUDY TAKALA
Case DescriptionRudy Takala, an associate editor at The Hill, submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Election Commission for records concerning FEC travel expenses. Takala requested inclusion in the news media fee category and asked for a fee waiver as well. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. The agency emailed Takala and asked for a second extension, and suggested that he narrow the scope of his request. Takala did not narrow the scope of his request. The agency provided one interim response, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Takala filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-231COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5086117) filed by Rudy Takala. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons FEC, # 6 Summons AG, # 7 Summons Clerk)(Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-232NOTICE of corrected summons by Rudy Takala (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-23Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (md) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-244NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of RUDY TAKALA (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-255STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 25, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-316RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/28/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/27/2017. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-317RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/28/2017. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-318RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION served on 08/29/2017 (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-189NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff