Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. United States Department of the Interior
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv06422
Date Filed2017-08-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard J. Sullivan
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Natural Resources Defense Council submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning Secretary Ryan Zinke's travel to Interior-administered lands. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-231COMPLAINT against United States Department of the Interior. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14048644)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-232CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-233REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of the Interior, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-234FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-235FIRST MOTION for Jacqueline Miya Iwata to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14049616. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Affidavit Affirdavit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-24>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 5 FIRST MOTION for Jacqueline Miya Iwata to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14049616. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-24***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mitchell S. Bernard. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., United States Department of the Interior. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (rch) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-246ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of the Interior. (rch) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-24CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (rch) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-24Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (rch) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-24Case Designated ECF. (rch) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-257ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 5 Motion for Jacqueline Miya Iwata to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/24/2017) (mro) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-288NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline M. Iwata on behalf of Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Iwata, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ann Jude on behalf of United States Department of the Interior. (Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-0710AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Department of the Interior served on 8/28/2017, answer due 9/27/2017. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Receipt for Interior, # 2 Exhibit Receipt for Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Receipt for USAO)(Iwata, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-0811ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for an initial conference on Friday, October 6, 2017 at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, and as further set forth herein. (Initial Conference set for 10/6/2017 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/8/2017) (ras) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff