Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01760
Date Filed2017-08-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the Broadcasting Board of Governors for records concerning broadcasts of certain Farsi News and related records. Property of the People and Shapiro also asked to be included in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Property of the People's request for news media status. Property of the People filed an administrative appeal of the denial, which was upheld by the agency. After hearing nothing further from the agency concerning the processing of their request, Property of the People and Shapiro then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-281COMPLAINT against BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5093419) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-282LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-29Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-294STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/29/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff