Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01772
Date Filed2017-08-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning a 2016 Board of Land Appeals ruling in favor of WildEarth Guardians on the issue of whether BLM Field Managers had the delegated authority to approve coal leases. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told WildEarth Guardians that it was processing the request on the voluminous track. WildEarth Guardians filed an administrative appeal challenging the delay in processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
1845 C Street, NW
Washington, DC 20240
DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-301COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5096040) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Bureau of Land Management, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-302Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-30Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (sth) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-024ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/02/2017. (DM) (Entered: 09/02/2017)
2017-09-145NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/11/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/11/2017. (Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff