Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01777
Date Filed2017-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the translocation of the Louisiana black bears to the Three Rivers Complex area in Louisiana. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DefendantFISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
1849 C Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20240
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-311COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5097426) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Fish and Wildlife Service, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Attorney DC, # 5 Declaration Corp. Disclosure)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-012LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (zmd) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-01Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-054STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/05/17. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/11/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/11/2017. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-146NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-10-117MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-11MINUTE ORDER granting 7 defendant's motion for an extension of time. Defendant is directed to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than November 14, 2017. Counsel for defendant is admonished to seek extensions of time no fewer than three business days before a filing is due. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 11, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Or Otherwise Response To Complaint due by 11/14/2017. (mac) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-11-148ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE.(Johnson, Wyneva) Modified to add link on 11/15/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-159Consent MOTION to Stay Briefing by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-17MINUTE ORDER granting 9 defendant's motion to defer setting a briefing schedule in view of defendant's pending document production. The parties are directed to file a joint status report including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, by no later than January 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 17, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2018. (mac) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2018-01-1210Joint MOTION to Stay Briefing by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-16MINUTE ORDER. In view of 10 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, by no later than June 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 16, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2018. (mac) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-06-1511STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-07-10MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 11 joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, by August 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 10, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2018. (mac) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-08-0912Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10MINUTE ORDER granting 12 defendant's consent motion for extension of time to file joint status report. Defendant shall file a joint status report by no later than September 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/10/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Status Report due by 9/7/2018. (mac) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-3113Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-31MINUTE ORDER granting 13 defendant's consent motion for extension of time to file joint status report. Defendant shall file a joint status report by no later than October 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/31/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Status Report due by 10/5/2018. (mac) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-10-11MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, by no later than October 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/11/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2018. (mac) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-11-06MINUTE ORDER directing Jim Kurth, Acting Director of the United States Fish and Wildlife Service and government counsel to show cause why they should not be held in contempt for violating two of the Court's Orders by no later than November 14, 2018. The memoranda filed by the government shall include an explanation as to why the defendant has failed to comply with the Court's prior Minute Orders dated August 31 and October 11, 2018. The defendant is FURTHER ORDERED to file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, by that same date. Any request for an extension to file the joint status report will not be viewed favorably. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/6/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause due by 11/14/2018. Joint Status Report due by 11/14/2018. (mac) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-1414STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-1415RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, filed by UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar