Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01780
Date Filed2017-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning EPA Administrator Scott Pruitt's announcement that he would create a task force to recommend changes in the administration of the Superfund program. PEER also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted PEER a fee waiver. The agency published the recommendations of the Superfund task force, but that report only responded to a portion of PEER's request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-311COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5097597) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons EPA, # 3 Summons Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons Summons US Attorney DC, # 5 Declaration Corp. Disclosure)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-31Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-312LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zsb) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-074ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/6/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/6/2017. (Dinerstein, Paula) Modified on 9/8/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-08NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to pdinerstein@peer.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Incorrect document/case, 3. Please refile document, 4. ENTERED IN ERROR; Incorrect document attached; Refile as to US Attorney; Also file as to US Attorney General and Federal Defendant. (znmw, ) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/6/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/6/2017. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-086NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-11NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to pdinerstein@peer.org, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please refile document, 3. Additional entries required; Also file as a Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney General and Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant. (znmw, ) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/6/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/6/2017. (Dinerstein, Paula) Modified date of service and deadline on 9/13/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/7/2017. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-129RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 9/6/2017 (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-10-0610ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/6/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/20/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-2011Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-24MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before November 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/24/2017. (lccrc1). (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-10-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-11-2012Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/22/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/19/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2018-01-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file another status report by March 1, 2018 updating the Court on the status of the Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/22/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff