Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReilly v. Justice
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2017cv01469
Date Filed2017-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vanessa L. Bryant
PlaintiffThomas K. Reilly
Case DescriptionThomas Reilly, a filmmaker, submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning an investigation of corruption in Bridgeport, CT. Reilly also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Reilly filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDept of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-08-311COMPLAINT against Dept of Justice, filed by Thomas K. Reilly.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-08-31Filing fee received from Thomas K. Reilly: $400.00, receipt number 466951. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-08-312STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/31/2017.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-08-313ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/31/2017.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-014NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Order Re: Chambers Practices, 1 Complaint filed by Thomas K. Reilly, 2 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2017.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-015ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dept of Justice* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. *Thomas K. Reilly* *158 Westway Road* *Southport, CT 06890* (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-086MOTION to Compel Production by Thomas K. Reilly.Responses due by 9/29/2017 (Payton, R.) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-087MOTION for by Pro Se Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing Order by Thomas K. Reilly. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-088Consent to Electronic Notice by Thomas K. Reilly (Payton, R.) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-129ORDER granting 7 Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/12/2017. (Hoffman, S) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-1210ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/12/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff