Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGottfried v. U.S. Department of State
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2017cv05210
Date Filed2017-09-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ann M Donnelly
PlaintiffBradley Gottfried
Case DescriptionBradley Gottfried submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's position that it is not required to determine if a foreign country receiving U.S. aid has had a coup d'etat. After waiting more than three years for a response, Gottfied finally filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-051COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State, filed by Bradley Gottfried. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-052Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-05FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653118909 (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-063In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-07ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 9/7/2017. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-084MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9812886. by Bradley Gottfried. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, # 2 Admission Information GA Certificate of Good Standing) (Perez-Matos, Cecilia) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-115ORDER, granting 4 Notice of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice . The admitted attorney Cecilia Perez-Matos , as a member of the firm of The Perez-Matos Law Firm, as attorney pro hac vice is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel for Plaintiff Bradley Gottfried . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 9/11/2017. (The attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-136NOTICE of Appearance by Cecilia Perez-Matos on behalf of Bradley Gottfried (notification declined or already on case) (Perez-Matos, Cecilia) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-10-127AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State, filed by Bradley Gottfried. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7) (Perez-Matos, Cecilia) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff