Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01834
Date Filed2017-09-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for communications to and from former Secretary Jeh Johnson and other officials mentioning Donald Trump and other Republicans as well as groups like the Southern Poverty Law Center. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked FAIR to narrow its scope. FAIR declined to do so. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
US Department of Homeland Security
3801 Nebraska Ave., N.W.
DC, DC 20016
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-071COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5106307) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons Summons for Defendant, # 4 Summons Summons for U.S. Attorney)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-07Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (jd) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-112STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/11/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-134LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-205NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Rose Rehberg on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Rehberg, Sarah) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-10-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/19/2017. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-177RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/19/2017. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-178RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff