Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01836
Date Filed2017-09-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Small Business Administration for records concerning the activities of Senior White House Counsel Mary Anne Bradfield at the agency. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency denied CREW's request for a fee waiver. CREW filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-071COMPLAINT against U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5106842) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons to Small Business Administration, # 4 Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-073MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura C. Beckerman, :Firm- Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, :Address- 455 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.. Phone No. - (202) 408-5565. Fax No. - (202) 588-5020 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5106950. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-07Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (md) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-11SUMMONS (3) Not Issued as to U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (INCORRECT SUMMONS WERE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED. FOIA SUMMONS NEED TO BE SUBMITTED.) (md) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-124NOTICE of Corrected Summons by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attorney General, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-13MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Laura C. Beckerman is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/13/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-135SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-156NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Cindy Beckerman on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Beckerman, Laura) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/18/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/18/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION served on 9/18/2017 (Beckerman, Laura) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-138NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-139ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1610ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 30, 2017. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/16/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2017. (mac) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff