Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01855
Date Filed2017-09-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning the use of a government plane by Secretary Mnuchin on a trip to Lexington, Kentucky. CREW also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5109969) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of the Treasury, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-112Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-11Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (md) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-13SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney for D.C., and for U.S. Attorney General. (INCORRECT SUMMONS WERE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED. FOIA SUMMONS NEEDS TO BE SUBMITTED). (js) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-143NOTICE of Corrected Summons by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attorney General, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-144SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON served on 9/19/2017 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/19/2017. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-217RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/19/2017. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-288NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-199ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-2610MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, B,C, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-11-0211Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-0712REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-14MINUTE ORDER: The parties are to appear for a Hearing on Motion 10 for Preliminary Injunction set for 11/16/2017 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. So ordered by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/14/17. (lsj) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-16Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2017 re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. Oral arguments heard. A Status Conference is set for 12/1/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-2013ORDER denying as moot 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/20/17. (nbn) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-12-01Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 12/1/2017. A Status Report is due by 12/15/2017. Status Conference set for 12/18/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Janice Dickman) (nbn) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-14MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Status Conference set for 12/18/2017 at 2:00 PM is reset to 11:30 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. So ordered by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/14/17. (lsj) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-1514Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-1815SCHEDULING ORDER adopting Joint Status Report 14 . It is further ORDERED that the Status Conference set for 12/18/2017 is hereby VACATED Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/18/17. (lsj) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff