Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01865
Date Filed2017-09-12
Date Closed2017-12-15
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffPEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY
Case DescriptionRight Wing Watch, a project of People for the American Way, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning what Attorney General Sessions was told by the FBI pertaining to whether or not he was required to disclose meetings he had with Russian officials while he was a Senator. RWW also requested records concerning advice given to Secretary of Health and Human Services Tom Price as to how to fill out his disclosure forms. RWW requested expedited processing. The agency denied RWW's request for expedited processing in regard to the request about Price. After hearing nothing further from the agency, RWW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-121COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5112361) filed by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplement Notice of Designation of Related Civil Case Pending in This Court, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-122LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-123NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. Case related to Case No. 17-727. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-12Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-124STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/12/17. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-195SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/25/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/25/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 9/25/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/25/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-037NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-258NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Rachael Lynn Westmoreland on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Joshua L. Rogers (Westmoreland, Rachael) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-259ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Original FOIA Request)(Westmoreland, Rachael) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-27MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on November 16, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21. The parties are further ORDERED to meet and confer prior to the status conference to discuss scheduling for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/27/17. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-27Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/16/2017, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-11-16MINUTE ORDER: The status conference scheduled for November 16, 2017, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED to November 20, 2017, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/16/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-1610NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot M. Mincberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mincberg, Elliot) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-16Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 11/16/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 11/20/2017, at 10:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-20Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 11/20/2017. Government's Response due by 12/7/2017; Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2017. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook) (kt) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-12-1511STIPULATION of Dismissal by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-15MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/15/17. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff