Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01868
Date Filed2017-09-12
Date Closed2018-03-30
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Energy & Environment Legal Institute submitted two FOIA requests to the National Cancer Institute for specific grants and contracts approved by the agency. The agency told EELI that its requests were being put on the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EELI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-121COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5112630) filed by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Civil Process Clerk of US Attorney, # 3 Summons To Dept of Health and Human Services, # 4 Summons to Attorney General, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-122Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-12Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-10-184NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-185ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-206ORDER. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before November 17, 2017. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/20/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff due by 11/17/2017. (tg) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-11-177STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-20MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status report by February 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/20/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2018-02-028Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-05MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report by March 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/05/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2018. (kt) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-03-019Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-02MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report by March 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/02/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-3010STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff