Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleConduent State Healthcare LLC et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2017cv02423
Date Filed2017-09-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Sam R Cummings
PlaintiffConduent State Healthcare LLC
formerly known as Xerox State Healthcare LLC
PlaintiffFoley Hoag LLP
Case DescriptionConduent State Healthcare, a healthcare provider, submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning its audit pertaining to the government's attempts to recover $133 million in alleged Medicare overpayments from the State of Texas. OIG responded to the request, disclosing some records, but withholding others under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Conduent State Healthcare filed an administrative appeal to the agency, but after hearing nothing further Conduent State Healthcare filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-121COMPLAINT against United States Department of Health and Human Services filed by Foley Hoag LLP, CONDUENT STATE HEALTHCARE, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8665876) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Walters, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-122CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CONDUENT STATE HEALTHCARE, LLC, Foley Hoag LLP identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Conduent Incorporated for CONDUENT STATE HEALTHCARE, LLC. (Walters, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-123New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-124Request for Clerk to issue Summons to United States Dept of Health and Human Services filed by Conduent State Healthcare LLC, Foley Hoag LLP. (Walters, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-125Request for Clerk to issue Summons to United States Dept of Health and Human Services c/o U.S. Attorney for Northern District of Texas filed by Conduent State Healthcare LLC, Foley Hoag LLP. (Walters, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-126Request for Clerk to issue Summons to United States Dept of Health and Human Services c/o Attorney General of the United States filed by Conduent State Healthcare LLC, Foley Hoag LLP. (Walters, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-127Summons issued as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ran) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-198SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Department of Health and Human Services; served on 9/13/2017. (aaa) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-10-039SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Walters, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-0310SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Walters, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-1311ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Mary M. Watkins Cherry-DOJ added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft) (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1312CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff