Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01898
Date Filed2017-09-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Public Integrity submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning contacts between five named agency employees regarding Michael Borden or Rick Boucher of the law firm of Sidley Austin or Andrey Kostin of VTB bank. The Center also requested expedited processing. The State Department acknowledged receipt of the requesta and granted the Center expedited processing for each one. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Public Integrity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5117694) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-15Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/19/2017. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-10-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/2/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from Dep't of State)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-197ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) Modified on 10/20/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-198MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Errata by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Extension of Time)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) Modified event title on 10/20/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-11-029ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) Modified to add link on 11/3/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-12-2210WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 2/16/2018.....MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) Modified on 2/20/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-0811First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-0812Memorandum in opposition to re 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-1713Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-2414REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report in Case 17-770)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-02-0615WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 2/16/2018..... MOTION for Hearing re 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or for Status Hearing by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) Modified on 2/20/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-1616NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Pfaffenroth on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-1617NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , 15 MOTION for Hearing re 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or for Status Hearing (Joint notice of withdrawal by the parties, combined with joint status report and motion for order) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-1618Joint MOTION for Order , combined with Joint Status Report and Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Pending Motions by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-1619Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (See Docket Entry 17 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-05-1420ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. ORDERED that the Defendants' motion is hereby GRANTED, Nunc Pro Tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/14/18. (nbn) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-1421ORDER granting 18 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/14/18. (znbn) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-1522ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/14/18. (nbn) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar