Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01900
Date Filed2017-09-15
Date Closed2018-01-16
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
Case DescriptionCenter for Public Integrity submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Treasury concerning payments made with public funds to the Trump Transition, also known as Trump for America, or anyone acting on behalf of the Trump Transition. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Public Integrity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5118659) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons to Attorney General)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-18Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/19/2017. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-225ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/22/2017. (DM) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-256NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of All Defendants (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-10-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 9/25/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-129AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Defendant GSA, # 2 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons to Attorney General)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-1310SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (znmw) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1311SUMMONS (2) Reissued Electronically as to to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1312RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/13/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2017. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1913RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 10/18/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/19/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt - GSA, # 2 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt - Attorney General)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-11-0614AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT against Defendant U.S. Department of the Treasury by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-08VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 11/9/2017.....MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 6(a)(1), 12(a)(2), and 15(a)(3), Defendant U.S. Department of the Treasury shall respond to the 9 Amended Complaint on or before NOVEMBER 20, 2017, the next business day following the expiration of the 60-day period dating from service of the 1 Complaint on the U.S. Attorney. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 8, 2017. (lcckk1) Modified on 11/13/2017 (tth). (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-0915MOTION to Modify the Court's Minute Order of 11/08/2017 by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant U.S. Department of the Treasury's Response to the Amended Complaint due by 12/20/2017. (tth) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-09MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's 15 Motion to Modify the Court's Minute Order. That Motion is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. The Court's November 8, 2017, Minute Order is vacated. Due to confusion created by the docket, Defendants' response shall be due by NOVEMBER 13, 2017, with any extension granted only for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 9, 2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response due by 11/13/2017. (dot) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-1316ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-1417ORDER. The parties shall file the schedule not later than DECEMBER 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 14, 2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall file the schedule by 12/14/2017. (dot) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-12-1418Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 18 Joint Motion to Extend Time to File the Joint Status Report. In light of the parties' representation that they "have tentatively reached agreement on how to resolve this case without further litigation," that motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc . The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by JANUARY 15, 2018 , proposing a schedule for any further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 15, 2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2018-01-1619STIPULATION of Dismissal by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-1620ORDER. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 16, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff