Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePISTON v. USCIS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01903
Date Filed2017-09-15
Date Closed2017-12-04
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffMICHAEL E. PISTON
Case DescriptionMichael Piston, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records about his client Sudheer Thondapu. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Piston filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantUSCIS
111 Massachusetts Ave
Washington, DC 20529
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-151COMPLAINT Michael E. Piston against USCIS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5118998) filed by Michael Piston. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-152REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE United States Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Michael Piston.(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-153REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE United States Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Michael Piston.(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-154REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE United States Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Michael Piston.(Piston, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-15Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (jd) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-195SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-10-276Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-30MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 27, 2017. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/30/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/27/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-12-027NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MICHAEL E. PISTON (Piston, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff