Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01914
Date Filed2017-09-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Environmental Integrity Project submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning travel expenses for administrator Scott Pruitt and his staff. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EIP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-191COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5122434) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons EPA, # 8 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 9 Summons Attorney General)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Attachment 6 replaced on 9/20/2017) (js). (Attachment 6 replaced on 9/20/2017) (js). (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-19Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (js) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-202Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Schaeffer, Eric) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/20/2017) (jd). Modified to replace fillable document on 9/20/2017 (jd). (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-214MOTION for Summary Judgment by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Sylvia Lam and Exhibits)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff