Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01917
Date Filed2017-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Energy & Environment Legal Institute submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute for Environmental Studies for records concerning emails and attachments that contained certain specific keywords. EELI also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of one of the requests. The agency denied EELI's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EELI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-201COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5123770) filed by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Civil Process Clerk of US Attorney, # 3 Summons To Dept of Health and Human Services, # 4 Summons to Attorney General, # 5 Exhibit 1)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-202SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-10-163NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-264Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-265ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (McBride, Patricia) Modified on 10/27/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-27NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; emailed to patricia.mcbride@usdoj.gov, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect document/case, 2. Please refile document, 3. ENTERED IN ERROR; Incorrect case; Please refile in 17cv1717. (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-276Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-30MINUTE ORDER: Granting 4 6 Consent Motions for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 6, 2017. The parties are hereby reminded that Local Civil Rule 7(c) requires that "[e]ach motion... shall be accompanied by a proposed order." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/30/17. (DJS) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-12-057Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-05MINUTE ORDER: Granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/5/17. (DJS) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/20/2017. (tb) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-208ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-20MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 1/26/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/20/17. (DJS) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2018. (tb) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2018-01-229Unopposed MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-23MINUTE ORDER: Finding as moot 9 Motion to Stay, except that the parties shall file their joint report and proposed order by 2/1/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/23/18. (DJS) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2018. (tb) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-02-0110Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-06MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 10 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time is hereby granted. The joint status report and proposed order are due on February 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/18. (DJS) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2018. (tb) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-0811Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-09MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 11 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by 10/8/18. The parties are hereby reminded that their joint report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/9/18. (DJS) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/8/2018. (tb) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-10-0912Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-22MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 12 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or a further joint status report and proposed order by November 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/22/18. (DJS) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-11-0713Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-08MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joints status report 13 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a joint status and proposed order or a notice of dismissal by November 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/8/18. (DJS) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/14/2018. (tb) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/14/2018. (tb) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar