Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01921
Date Filed2017-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning the basis for statements made by the White House that Syria was preparing a chemical attack. Democracy Forward also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Democracy Forward filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-201COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5124513) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-202Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-21Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-213SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-21SUMMONS (2) Not Issued as to U.S ATTORNEY and U.S ATTORNEY GENERAL.....SUMMONS NOT SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED. (zsb) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-10-024REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-035SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-096GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/9/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/09/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff