Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01937
Date Filed2017-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning the implementation of President Trump's executive order to cut back on regulations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
725 17th Street NW
Washington, DC 20503
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-221COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5127842) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-222NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M. Sherman on behalf of PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-22Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-264STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order.Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/26/17. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-10-025NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-256ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-27MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than November 27, 2017. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 27, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/27/2017. (mac) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-11-277Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-28MINUTE ORDER. In view of 7 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, by no later than December 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 28, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2017. (mac) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-12-048Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule for Disclosure by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-11MINUTE ORDER. In view of 8 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than May 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 11, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2018. (mac) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2018-05-159Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER. In view of 9 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 11, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2018. (mac) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-09-1710STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-1811STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-10-02MINUTE ORDER. In light of 10 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Status Report due by 11/16/2018. (mac) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar