Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01938
Date Filed2017-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning the agency's implementation of President Trump's executive order to cut back on regulations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-221COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5127887) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-222NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M. Sherman on behalf of PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-22Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-10-024NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-255ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF LABOR.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-25MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. Since the requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not apply, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by November 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/25/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/9/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-11-096Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-14MINUTE ORDER: In light of 6 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order by November 29, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/14/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/29/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-297Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-30MINUTE ORDER: In light of 7 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a joint proposed scheduling order by December 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/30/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/6/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-068Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule for Disclosure by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-08MINUTE ORDER: In light of 8 the parties' joint proposed schedule, the schedule for production in this case shall be as follows: Defendant will disclose the non-exempt portions of all records from the Office of the Secretary by December 15, 2017; Defendant shall process records from the Mine Safety and Health Administration at a rate of approximately 500 pages per month, with the first production occurring on January 15, 2018; and Defendant shall review and produce approximately 500 pages of Occupational Health and Safety Administration records per month, with the first production occurring on January 15, 2018. The parties shall file a joint status report by May 15, 2018 updating the Court on the progress of production and, if necessary, proposing a further schedule for production or briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/8/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2018-05-159Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of 9 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by June 15, 2018 updating the Court on the status of production and proposing a further schedule for production or, if necessary, briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/16/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-06-1510Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-15MINUTE ORDER: In light of 10 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by July 15, 2018 updating the Court on the status of production and proposing a further schedule for production and, if necessary, briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/15/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-07-1311Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-17MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' joint status report shall now be due by July 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/17/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/27/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-2712Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-30MINUTE ORDER: In light of 12 the parties' joint status report, production shall proceed as follows: Defendant shall review approximately 750 pages of OSHA records and produce responsive pages by September 14, 2018. Thereafter, Defendant shall review approximately 500 pages of OSHA records per month and produce responsive pages, with the first production occurring on October 15, 2018. The parties shall file a further joint status report on October 19, 2018 updating the Court on the status of production and, if necessary, proposing a further schedule for production or briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/30/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-10-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Sherman, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 13 joint status report, the parties shall filed an updated joint status report on or before March 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/22/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar