Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStegemann v. Berkshire County District Attorney's Office et al
DistrictDistrict of New Hampshire
CityConcord
Case Number1:2017cv00405
Date Filed2017-09-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr
PlaintiffJoshua G. Stegemann
Case DescriptionJoshua Stegemann filed suit against the Berkshire County District Attorney's Office for records about his case. This is not a FOIA suit since Berkshire County is not a federal agency.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantBerkshire County District Attorney's Office
DefendantDavid F. Capeless
DefendantRensselaer County District Attorney's Office
DefendantJoel Abelove
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [6]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-111COMPLAINT against Joel Abelove, Berkshire County District Attorney's Office, David F. Capeless, Rensselaer County District Attorney's Office filed by Joshua G. Stegemann. (mc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2017: # 1 Summonses) (mc). (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-18NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click HERE . (mc) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-182ORDER - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Certificate of Custodial Institution, and Prisoner Consent Form. ORDER Signed by Megan Cahill, Deputy Clerk. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 11/13/2017. (mc) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-253MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with Custodial Certificate and Prisoner Consent Form filed by Joshua G. Stegemann. (mc) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-25Application complete - case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. New case number is 1:17-cv-405-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-26VACATED PER MAGISTRATE JUDGE ANDREA K. JOHNSTONE, DATED 10/3/2017. ENDORSED ORDER denying 3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs Text of Order: A review of the custodial certificate in this matter indicates that Stegemann's account balance is greater than the $400.00 filing fee. Accordingly, the motion is denied. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee on or before October 27, 2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (mc) Modified on 10/3/2017 to add: vacated text(ko). (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-10-034REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 3 Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, recommending the district judge should deny Stegemann's motion for in forma pauperis status (Doc. No. 3), and direct Stegemann to pay the filing fee in this matter within thirty days of the date of the Order approving this Report and Recommendation. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 10/17/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (mc) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-125OBJECTION to 4 Report and Recommendation filed by Joshua G. Stegemann. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter / Envelope)(vln) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-166ORDER approving 4 Report and Recommendation. The plaintiff's motion for in forma pauperis status (Doc. No. 3) is denied. Joshua G. Stegemann is directed to pay the filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff