Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. U.S. Department of Energy
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv07296
Date Filed2017-09-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Naomi Reice Buchwald
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Natural Resources Defense Council submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning the effect of President Trump's executive order cutting back on regulations on standards for portable air conditioners and other cooling equipment. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the NRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Energy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-251COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Energy. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14166276)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-252CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-253FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Energy, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Marks, Nancy) Modified on 9/26/2017 (rch). (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-254RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-265MOTION for Daniel Nathan Carpenter-Gold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14168308. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Carpenter-Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-26>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 5 MOTION for Daniel Nathan Carpenter-Gold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14168308. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nancy Sharman Marks. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S. Department of Energy. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party names must be entered as they appear on complaint, no abbreviations. (rch) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-26***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nancy Sharman Marks to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): defendant's name in docket text must match defendant's name on summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (rch) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-26CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (rch) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-26Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (rch) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-26Case Designated ECF. (rch) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-266REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Energy, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Carpenter-Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-267ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 5 Motion for Daniel N. Carpenter-Gold to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/26/2017) (ap) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-278ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Energy. (kl) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff