Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01991
Date Filed2017-09-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Case DescriptionThe American Center for Law and Justice submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning requests by former UN Ambassador Samantha Powers to unmask identifying surveillance information about Donald Trump when he was a candidate. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ACLJ filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5134154) filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-27Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sth) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-272SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-273STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/27/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-10-124NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart J. Roth on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Roth, Stuart) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-125NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Paul Sisney on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-126LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff