Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01993
Date Filed2017-09-27
Date Closed2017-11-15
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning Secretary Ryan Zinke's attendance at a conference hosted by the American Petroleum Institute and held at Trump International Hotel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5134400) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Shaw, Conor) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-27Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (jd) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-282SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-013ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/01/2017. (DM) (Entered: 10/01/2017)
2017-10-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 10/2/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/2/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/1/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/02/2017. (Shaw, Conor) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-305NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-306Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-31MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant requests an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint because defense counsel has been busy with other matters and has been out of the office with a medical emergency. Defendant represents that the extension will give Plaintiff time to review recently released records, give Defendant time to issue a final response to Plaintiff's FOIA request, give defense counsel time to confer with agency counsel, and give the parties time to confer about what if any issues remain in this case. Plaintiff consents to this request. Defendant's motion is accordingly GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than DECEMBER 1, 2017. However, the Court notes, as Defendant has acknowledged, that this motion was untimely. The Order Establishing Procedures in this case states that "Motions for extensions of time must be filed at least four (4) business days prior to the first affected deadline." ECF No. 3 and 3. The Court expects all future motions to be filed in a timely fashion. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/31/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to complaint due by 12/1/2017. (tb) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-157STIPULATION of Dismissal and Notice of Settlement by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-158ORDER Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/15/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff