Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02001
Date Filed2017-09-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
Case DescriptionThe Western Values Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning correspondence involving Mary Pletcher, Assistant Secretary for Human Capital and Diversity containing references to Executive Resources Board or ERB. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Western Values Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-281COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5135392) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Rule 7.1 certificate, # 3 Summons Dep't of the Interior, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Sobel, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/28/2017) (zsth). (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-282LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (sth) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-28Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sth) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/3/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/2/2017. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 10/2/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/3/2017. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-026NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-027ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-02MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 11/30/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/2/17. (DJS) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2017. (tb) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-308Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-01MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 8 , it is hereby ordered that the Defendant shall process at least 1,000 pages monthly, with production of documents on the following dates: December 29, 2017, January 31, 2018, February 28, 2018, March 30, 2018 and April 30, 2018. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report and proposed order by June 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/1/17. (DJS) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2018. (tb) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff