Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNew York Times Company et al v. U.S. Department Of Justice et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv07439
Date Filed2017-09-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Katherine B. Forrest
PlaintiffNew York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records containing various keywords pertaining to college affirmative action admission standards. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and put it in its complex queue for processing. Savage also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for similar records. The agency asked Savage to narrow the scope of his request, which he did. However, after hearing nothing further from either agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment Of Justice
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantU.S. Department of Education
DefendantDepartment of Education
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-281COMPLAINT against Department Of Justice, Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14183881)Document filed by New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-282RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Grupo Financiero Inbursa de S.A.B. de C.V for New York Times Company. Document filed by New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-283FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice; Department of Education, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. (McCraw, David) Modified on 9/29/2017 (pc). (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-29***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Edward McCraw. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Department Of Justice, Department of Education. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pc) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-29***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David Edward McCraw to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-29***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Parties listed on the docket entry for the summons must be written exactly as they appear on the complaint caption title. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-29CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-29Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-29Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-294CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-295REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Education; U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-026ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Department of Justice. (kl) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-02NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (ma) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-027ORDER: Accordingly, the Court hereby directs the parties to confer and file a joint letter stating whether you agree and, if so, proposing a briefing schedule in this matter. The joint letter shall be filed by the parties not later than Monday, October 30, 2017. Additionally, it is hereby ORDERED that lead counsel for all parties shall appear for a conference on Thursday, November 2, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 11/2/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/02/2017) (ama) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff