Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAjamu v. Yates Willis et al
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityOrlando
Case Number6:2017cv01709
Date Filed2017-09-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.
PlaintiffD.'Uryyah Ajamu
Case DescriptionD. Urtyyah Willis, the brother of a disabled veteran, filed suit against the Department of Veterans Affairs after the agency failed to provide information about how much money his brother was entitled to for his disability. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantDenise Yates Willis
DefendantU.S Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-291COMPLAINT against U.S Department of Veterans Affairs, Denise Yates Willis with Jury Demand filed by D.'Uryyah Ajamu. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B1, # 4 Exhibit B2, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M1, # 16 Exhibit M2, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O1, # 19 Exhibit O2, # 20 Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Q1, # 22 Exhibit Q2)(DMA) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-09-292MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by D.'Uryyah Ajamu. (DMA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-043REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency filed by D.'Uryyah Ajamu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/4/2017. (ECJ) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-064ORDER reassigning this case to another District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 10/6/2017. (SC) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-065Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. as presider. New case number: 6:17-cv-1709-ORL-37KRS. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (JP) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff