Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTroncoso v. Sheriff of Middlesex County et al
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
Case Number1:2017cv11859
Date Filed2017-09-27
Date Closed2018-01-31
JudgeJudge F. Dennis Saylor, IV
PlaintiffManuel Troncoso
Case DescriptionManuel Troncoso, a state prisoner, sued the U.S. District Court in Massachusetts to force the Middlesex County Sheriff's Office to disclose information about nutrition dietary meals. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantSheriff of Middlesex County
DefendantCarole Cafferty Superintendent
DefendantKitchen Deputy
Opinion/Order [5]
User-contributed Documents
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-221COMPLAINT / Motion to Inspect against All Defendants, filed by Manuel Troncoso.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-272General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-273ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-12-204NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Manuel Troncoso (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2018-01-315Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. [Copy of order placed in mail room on 1/31/18 to be delivered to USPS on 2/1/2018.](PSSA, 3) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-316Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE [Copy of order for plaintiff placed in mail room on 1/31/2018 for pickup by USPS on 2/1/2018.](PSSA, 3) Modified on 1/31/2018 (PSSA, 3). (Entered: 01/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff