Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Department of Transportation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv07510
Date Filed2017-10-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge P. Kevin Castel
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffBenjamin Protess
Case DescriptionReporter Benjamin Protess of the New York Times submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning two high-speed railroad proposals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Protess later contacted the agency to inquire about its status and the agency told him it was being processed. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Transportation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-021COMPLAINT against Department of Transportation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14194468)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Benjamin Protess.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-022CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-023RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Grupo Financiero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-024REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Transportation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Protess, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-03CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (vf) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-03Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (vf) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-03Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-035ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Transportation. (vf) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-036ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/1/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/3/2017) (cf) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff