Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBrennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law v. United States Department of State
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv07520
Date Filed2017-10-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul G. Gardephe
PlaintiffBrennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law
Case DescriptionThe Brennan Center for Justice submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning 23 categories of records pertaining to the travel ban. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the Brennan Center's requests for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency also said it would notify the Brennan Center once records were located. The Brennan Center then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [30]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in New York has ruled that the Department of State must expedite the processing of the Brennan Center's FOIA request for six documents concerning President Trump's travel ban within a month. After the Trump administration issued its second travel ban, the Brennan Center sent a multi-part request to the State Department, which granted its request for expedited processing. Although the request was referred to the Department of Homeland Security as well, only six identified documents were currently at issue. After the agency had not responded in six months, the Brennan Center filed suit to force the agency to expedite its request, asking the court to order the agency to disclose the records within 21 days and provide a Vaughn index as well. The agency argued the Brennan Center's timeline was not practicable because parts of its request had been referred to DHS, the records pertained to national security, and there was no legal obligation for the agency to provide a Vaughn index before it submitted its summary judgment motion. The court pointed out that "it has now been nearly six months since Plaintiff's FOIA request was submitted, and nothing has been produced. Nor is there any schedule for production. Accordingly, the presumption of agency delay applies." Turning to the State Department's claims, the court noted that "as an initial matter, Defendant cannot evade responsibility for failing to produce the requested records by referring the request to DHS or other Executive Branch components for review." The court pointed out that "moreover, Defendant's claim that Plaintiff's request is 'broad and complex' and 'burdensome' in light of the State Department's backlog of FOIA requests is not supported by the records. Although Defendant argues that Plaintiff's FOIA request contains twenty-three sub-parts, Defendant has conceded that Plaintiff is seeking 'only a subset of [these] records in this litigation' and that only 'six documents' are actually in dispute. . .Accordingly, Defendant has not demonstrated that production of the non-exempt portions of the six documents at issue " with an explanation as to which exemptions apply to material that is withheld " would be overly burdensome." On the issue of a Vaughn index, the court observed that "while 'a Vaughn Index is not. . .required. . . "where it is not [necessary] to restore the traditional adversary process" " because the 'requestor has acquired sufficient facts to permit the adversary process to function' " here the State Department has provided no information regarding the exemptions it plans to claim." The court concluded that "because (1) Plaintiff has demonstrated that its FOIA request merits expedited treatment, and (2) Defendant has not rebutted the presumption of agency delay, Plaintiff's motion to expedite will be granted." The court ordered the agency to produce non-exempt records and a Vaughn index by Feb. 3.
Issues: Expedited processing
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-021COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14196219)Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, September 24, 2017 Proclamation by President Trump, # 2 Exhibit B, FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit C, Interim Response by Department of State, # 4 Exhibit D, August 24, 2017 Email from L. Qadir to Department of State, # 5 Exhibit E, August 28, 2017 Email from Department of State to L. Qadir)(Roman, Neil) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-022CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Roman, Neil) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-023RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law.(Roman, Neil) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-024REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Roman, Neil) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-03CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (kl) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-03Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (kl) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-03Case Designated ECF. (kl) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-035ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State. (kl) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-116MOTION for Mark H. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14231385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B, Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit C, Declaration of Mark H. Lynch)(Lynch, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-117NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Johnathan James Smith on behalf of Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-12>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 6 MOTION for Mark H. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14231385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-128MOTION for Jaclyn E. Martinez Resly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14236576. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B, Texas Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit C, Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit D, Declaration of Jaclyn E. Martinez Resly)(Martinez Resly, Jaclyn) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-12>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 8 MOTION for Jaclyn E. Martinez Resly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14236576. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-17NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-199ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 8 Motion for Jaclyn E. Martinez Resly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/19/2017) (cf) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-1910ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 6 Motion for Mark H. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/19/2017) (cf) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-1911FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 12 Affidavit) - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of State served on 10/3/2017, answer due 12/4/2017. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Martinez Resly, Jaclyn) Modified on 10/20/2017 (db). As per ecf_error email correspondence received on 1/20/17 @ 11:39am. (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-2012AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint,, served. United States Department of State served on 10/3/2017, answer due 11/2/2017. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Martinez Resly, Jaclyn) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-2513NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/4/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/25/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-2714MOTION for Richard Brian Katskee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14298668. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 certificates of good standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order, # 3 Affidavit declaration in support)(Katskee, Richard) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-30>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 14 MOTION for Richard Brian Katskee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14298668. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-0615NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Kendrick Connolly on behalf of United States Department of State. (Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-0616ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by United States Department of State.(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-0617ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 14 Motion for Richard B. Katskee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/6/17) (yv) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-0918MOTION for Andrew Lieb Nellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14346783. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of good standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order granting admission, # 3 Affidavit in support)(Nellis, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-0919MOTION for Eric Jonathan Rothschild to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14348344. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Certificates of good standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order granting admission, # 3 Affidavit in support)(Rothschild, Eric) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-13>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 19 MOTION for Eric Jonathan Rothschild to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14348344. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. , 18 MOTION for Andrew Lieb Nellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14346783. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-1620ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 19 Motion for Eric Jonathan Rothschild to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/15/2017) (ama) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-1621ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 18 Motion for Andrew Lieb Nellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/15/2017) (ama) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-12-2122MOTION to Expedite Freedom of Information Act Action . Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law.(Roman, Neil) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-2123MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Expedite Freedom of Information Act Action . . Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Roman, Neil) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-2124DECLARATION of Jaclyn E. Martinez Resly in Support re: 22 MOTION to Expedite Freedom of Information Act Action .. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - October 26, 2017 E-mail, # 2 Exhibit B - November 1, 2017 E-mail, # 3 Exhibit C - November 7, 2017 E-mail, # 4 Exhibit D - November 7, 2017 E-mail Reply, # 5 Exhibit E - November 10, 2017 E-mail, # 6 Exhibit F- November 15, 2017 E-mail, # 7 Exhibit G - November 17, 2017 E-mail, # 8 Exhibit H - November 21, 2017 E-mail, # 9 Exhibit I - November 22, 2017 E-mail, # 10 Exhibit J - November 29, 2017 E-mail, # 11 Exhibit K - Proposed Order)(Martinez Resly, Jaclyn) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-2125MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 22 MOTION to Expedite Freedom of Information Act Action . . Document filed by United States Department of State. (Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-2126DECLARATION of Eric F. Stein in Opposition re: 22 MOTION to Expedite Freedom of Information Act Action .. Document filed by United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-2127REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Expedite Freedom of Information Act Action . . Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Martinez Resly, Jaclyn) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-2728JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Neil K. Roman dated December 27, 2017 Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law.(Roman, Neil) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-2929NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
2018-01-04Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Telephone Conference held on 1/4/2018. (mr) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-1030MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: 22 MOTION to Expedite Freedom of Information Act Action filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiff's motion to expedite is granted. Defendant will produce all non-exempt materials and a declaration-consistent with Vaughn v. Rosen, 484 F.2d 820 (D.C. Cir. 1973)-explaining what exemptions apply to any materials withheld. Both the production of non-exempt materials and the Vaughn index will be produced by February 9, 2018. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 22). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/10/2018) (mro) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-02-2331LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Christopher Connolly dated February 23, 2018 re: government's request for leave to file motion for summary judgment. Document filed by United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-2832LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jaclyn E. Martinez Resly dated February 28, 2018 re: Defendant's Request for Leave to Move for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law.(Martinez Resly, Jaclyn) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-2833ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule will apply to Plaintiff's motion to compel a Vaughn index: 1. Plaintiff's motion is due on March 08, 2018; 2. Defendant's opposition is due on March 15, 2018. So ordered. (Motions due by 3/8/2018. Responses due by 3/15/2018) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/28/2018) (rjm) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-1534MOTION to Compel United States Department of State to Comply with the Court's January 10, 2018 Order . Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law.(Roman, Neil) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1535MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 MOTION to Compel United States Department of State to Comply with the Court's January 10, 2018 Order . . Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Roman, Neil) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1536MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 34 MOTION to Compel United States Department of State to Comply with the Court's January 10, 2018 Order . . Document filed by United States Department of State. (Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-04-1637ORDER denying 34 Letter Motion to Compel. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiff's motion to compel is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 34). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/16/2018) (mro) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 6/28/2018. Responses due by 7/12/2018 Replies due by 7/22/2018. (mro) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-2638JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing on the Parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Neil K. Roman dated June 26, 2018. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law.(Roman, Neil) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-2939ORDER granting 38 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/29/2018) (tro) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 7/23/2018 Replies due by 8/2/2018. (tro) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-0540NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ishita Kala on behalf of Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Kala, Ishita) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-08-0141MOTION for Kevin Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Plaintiff . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15395145. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - DC Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B - MA Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Kevin Barnett)(Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-01>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 41 MOTION for Kevin Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Plaintiff . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15395145. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0242ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 41 Motion for Kevin Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/2/2018) (js) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0243MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by United States Department of State.(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0244MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by United States Department of State. (Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0245DECLARATION of Eric F. Stein in Support re: 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0246DECLARATION of James V.M.L. Holzer in Support re: 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by United States Department of State. (Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0247DECLARATION of David M. Hardy in Support re: 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by United States Department of State. (Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0248CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law.(Roman, Neil) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0249MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 48 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Roman, Neil) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0250DECLARATION of Ishita Kala in Support re: 48 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 01 Berman 2/9/18 Letter to Roman, # 3 Exhibit 02 Stein Decl Ex 2_A1b, # 4 Exhibit 03 NBC Donald Trump's Plan for a Muslim Database Draws Comparisons to Nazi Germany, # 5 Exhibit 04 2015.12.07 Donald J. Trump Statement on Preventing Muslim Immigration, # 6 Exhibit 05 2015.12.08 MSNBC - Donald Trump on Muslim Travel Ban, # 7 Exhibit 06 2016.03.09 CNN - Anderson Cooper 360 Degrees Transcript, # 8 Exhibit 07 2016.10.09 The American Presidency Project, Presidential Debate at Washington Univ. in St. Louis, # 9 Exhibit 08 Exec. Order No. 13,769, 82 Fed. Reg. 8977 (Jan. 27, 2017), # 10 Exhibit 09 2017.01.29 Giuliani - Trump asked me how to do a Muslim ban legally, # 11 Exhibit 10 2017.01.29 N.Y. Times - How Trumps Rush to Enact an Immigration Ban, # 12 Exhibit 11 NYT_Trump's Immigration Ban Who is Barred and Who is Not, # 13 Exhibit 12 Exec. Order No. 13,780, 82 Fed. Reg. 13,209 (Mar. 9, 2017), # 14 Exhibit 13 DOD - Citizenship Likely an Unreliable Indicator of Terrorist Threat to the United States, # 15 Exhibit 14 Maintaining Enhanced Vetting Capabilities, # 16 Exhibit 15 Harsha Panduranga, et al., Extreme Vetting & the Muslim Ban, Brennan Ctr. for J. (2017), # 17 Exhibit 16 Transcript of Oral Argument at 3, Trump v. Hawaii, 138 S. Ct. 923 (2018) (No. 17-965), # 18 Exhibit 17 Fact Sheet - Proclamation on Enhancing Vetting Capabilities and Processes for Detecting (2017.09.24), # 19 Exhibit 18 Fact Sheet - President Donald J. Trump Strengthens Security Standards For Traveling to Am (2017.09.24), # 20 Exhibit 19 FAQ_ Proclamation on Enhancing Vetting Capabilities and Processes for Detect, # 21 Exhibit 20 2017.09.24 President Donald J. Trump Announces Enhanced National Security Measures Press, # 22 Exhibit 21 2017.09.26 State Dept News Briefing, # 23 Exhibit 22 Application (17A560) for Stay Pending App. to the U.S. Ct. App. 4th Cir. at 5, Trump v. IRAP, # 24 Exhibit 23 Oral Argument at 1.56.45, Intl Refugee Assistance Proj. v. Trump, 857 F.3d 554 (2017) (No. 17-1351), # 25 Exhibit 24 2017.07.12 Reuters - Elizabeth Culliford, Exlusive U.S. Demands Nations Provide More Traveler Data, # 26 Exhibit 25 2017.01.27 CBN News - Brody File Exclusive - President Trump Says Persecuted Christians Will Be Given, # 27 Exhibit 26 Donald Trump (@realDonaldTrump), Twitter (June 5, 2017, 3.29 a.m.), # 28 Exhibit 27 2017.03.15 CNN - Second Defeat for the White House on the Presidents Travel Ban, # 29 Exhibit 28 Br. for Pet., Trump v. Haw., No. 17-965 (Feb. 2018), # 30 Exhibit 29 Reply Brief for the Petitioners Trump v. Hawaii)(Roman, Neil) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0251RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Roman, Neil) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0252MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 48 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . and in further support of the government's motion for summary judgment . Document filed by United States Department of State. (Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0253CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment served on Defendant on July 9, 2018. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Roman, Neil) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0254REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 48 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Roman, Neil) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0255DECLARATION of Ishita Kala in Support re: 48 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30 - Dep't of Justice, OIP Guidance)(Roman, Neil) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0256CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply in Further Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment served on Defendant on August 2, 2018. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Roman, Neil) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar