Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02031
Date Filed2017-10-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning the decision to disband the Advisory Committee for the Sustained National Climate Assessment. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Biological Diversity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-031COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5141927) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-03Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (sth) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-032REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE CORRECTED Summons filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Crystal, Howard) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-033SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(sth) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-174NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-11-085ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-09MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before December 8, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/09/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-12-086Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-08MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before December 22, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/8/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-217STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of 7 defendant's status report, it is ORDERED that defendant must make its first production to plaintiff by March 30, 2018, and must file a status report on April 6, 2018. Defendant is ORDERED to make its next production to plaintiff by June 29, 2018, and to file a status report on July 6, 2018. Defendant is ORDERED to make its next production to plaintiff by September 28, 2018, and to file a status report on October 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/21/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2018-04-038NOTICE of Appearance by Sherri L. Morgan on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-069STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff