Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02032
Date Filed2017-10-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Competitive Enterprise Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning email correspondence involving two State Department employees containing various keywords pertaining to climate change. CEI also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, granted CEI's request for a fee waiver, but denied its request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CEI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5142136) filed by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for the US Attorney, # 3 Summons for the agency, the State Department, # 4 Summons for the Attorney General)(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-03Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (sth) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(sth) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-04Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-123Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-134NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-135NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. Attorney Hans Frank Bader terminated. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-136NOTICE of Appearance by Sam Kazman on behalf of COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE (Kazman, Sam) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-11-097NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-098ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-109ORDER. Both a complaint and an answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report not later than December 1, 2017. Please see the attached Order for details. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 11/10/2017. (lcapm2) Modified on 11/10/2017 to correct signature date (zcdw). (Entered: 11/10/2017)
2017-11-10Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/10/2017)
2017-11-1010RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/10/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/10/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/9/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/24/2017 (Kazman, Sam) (Entered: 11/10/2017)
2017-12-0111Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-01MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before March 5, 2018, that updates the court on their progress, advises the court whether summary judgment will be necessary and, if so, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/1/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-1112NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Devin Watkins on behalf of COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE (Watkins, Charles) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2018-03-0113Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-02MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 13 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases. This matter is hereby consolidated with Competitive Enterprise Institute v. U.S. Department of State, 17-cv-2438 (TJK). All pleadings relating to 17-cv-2438 shall, from here forward, be filed in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/2/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-0514Joint STATUS REPORT by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Charles) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-05MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before April 4, 2018, that contains a schedule for document production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/5/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/4/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-19CASE CONSOLIDATED. Case 17-2438 has been consolidated with 17-2032 pursuant to a Minute Court Order entered 3/2/2018. From this date forward all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead earlier case, Civil Action No. 17-2032. The parties are advised NOT to elect to SPREAD text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-04-0415STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-0516STATUS REPORT by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Watkins, Charles) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-05MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties 15 16 Status Reports and proposed schedule, the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on or before June 11, 2018, that updates the court on their progress. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/5/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/07/2018)
2018-06-1117Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-07-02MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before July 11, 2018, that updates the court on their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/2/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-1118Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-13MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before September 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/13/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-09-1819Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report updating the court on the processing of responsive records and recommending a course for further proceedings on or before October 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/20/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/18/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-10-1820Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-19MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report updating the court on the processing of responsive records and recommending a course for further proceedings on or before January 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/19/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar