Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02047
Date Filed2017-10-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning Russian interference in the 2016 election. EPIC also requested expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-041COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5145155) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-042Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-04Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/11/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/10/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/16/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing for the U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Affidavit of Mailing for the U.S. Department of Homeland Security)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-245NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-11-136NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Yuhee Lee on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Lee, Lynn) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-137ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Lee, Lynn) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed joint briefing schedule by November 27, 2017. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/13/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/27/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-278PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-28MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 8 Joint Proposed Schedule, the Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with an estimate of the time needed for processing and release of responsive records on or before February 1, 2018; (2) For category (A) documents Defendant shall search records created between January 1,2016, and the date the search is initiated; (3) For category (B) documents Defendant shall search records created between March 30, 2017, and the date the search is initiated; and (4) The parties shall confer on a reasonable processing and production schedule and provide the court with a status report on or before February 8, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/28/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/8/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2018-01-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-02-089Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-09MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: (1) DHS will process the 4,994 pages of potentially responsive records at a rate of 500 pages per month and release the non-exempt portions of the responsive records on a rolling production schedule; (2) The first interim production is due on March 15, 2018. Monthly productions will be made on the fifteenth of each month thereafter, unless the fifteenth is a weekend or federal holiday, in which case the production will be made on the next business day; (3) The rolling productions will be completed on or before January 15, 2019; and (4) Following the final production on January 15, 2019, the parties will confer and provide the court with a status report by January 31, 2019, to identify any remaining issues in dispute. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/9/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-09Set/Reset Deadlines: The first Interim Production is due by 3/15/2018. Final Production due by 1/15/2019. Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2019. (nbn) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-06-2010NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marcia Kay Sowles on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Substituting for attorney Lynn Lee (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-10-0311NOTICE of Change of Address by Marcia Kay Sowles (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar