Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKnight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv07572
Date Filed2017-10-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Andrew L. Carter, Jr
PlaintiffKnight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Case DescriptionThe Knight First Amendment Institute submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of State, and the Department of Justice for records concerning new vetting policies. The Knight First Amendment Institute also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request and several of them granted the Knight First Amendment Institute's request for expedited processing. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement denied the Knight First Amendment Institute's request for expedited processing. The Knight First Amendment Institute filed an administrative appeal of that denial and as a result, the agency disclosed 1,666 pages, but redacted all but 13 pages in their entirety. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Knight First Amendment Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
TERMINATED: 01/16/2018
DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantU.S. Department of State
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-041COMPLAINT against Citizenship and Immigration Services, Customs and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14203758)Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A (FOIA Request))(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-042CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-043RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-044FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - CAPTION TITLE ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) Modified on 10/5/2017 (kl). (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-045FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - CAPTION TITLE ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) Modified on 10/5/2017 (kl). (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-046FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - CAPTION TITLE ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) Modified on 10/5/2017 (kl). (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-047FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - CAPTION TITLE ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) Modified on 10/5/2017 (kl). (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-048FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - CAPTION TITLE ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) Modified on 10/5/2017 (kl). (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-049FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - CAPTION TITLE ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) Modified on 10/5/2017 (kl). (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-05CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (kl) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-05Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (kl) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-05Case Designated ECF. (kl) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-05***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jameel Jaffer to RE-FILE Document No. 9 Request for Issuance of Summons, 8 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons, 7 Request for Issuance of Summons, 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): PLEASE ENTER ALL PARTIES IN THE CAPTION TITLE THAT ARE VIEWABLE OR ENTER ET AL. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (kl) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-0510REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-0511REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-0512REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-0513REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-0514REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-0515REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-0616ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (kl) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-0617ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (kl) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-0618ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Justice. (kl) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-0619ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of State. (kl) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-0620ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (kl) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-0621ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (kl) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-2022AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/10/2017, answer due 10/31/2017; U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 10/10/2017, answer due 10/31/2017; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 10/10/2017, answer due 10/31/2017; U.S. Department of Justice served on 10/10/2017, answer due 10/31/2017; U.S. Department of State served on 10/10/2017, answer due 10/31/2017; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 10/10/2017, answer due 10/31/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-11-0924AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017; U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017; U.S. Department of State served on 11/7/2017, answer due 11/28/2017; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Delivery Confirmation)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-1325LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated November 13, 2017. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-1426ORDER: granting 25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The application is granted. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 12/28/2017; U.S. Customs and Border Protection answer due 12/28/2017; U.S. Department of Homeland Security answer due 12/28/2017; U.S. Department of Justice answer due 12/28/2017; U.S. Department of State answer due 12/28/2017; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 12/28/2017. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/14/2017) (ap) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-12-2827ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State.(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2017-12-2828LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated December 28, 2017 re: Immigration and Customs Enforcement Request for Pre-Motion Conference re Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2018-01-1129FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Jaffer, Jameel) Modified on 1/12/2018 (km). (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-1130LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Counsel for Plaintiff dated January 11, 2018 re: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement Request for Pre-Motion Conference re Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-12***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Jameel Jaffer for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 29 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with handwritten signatures of the attorneys to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (km) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-1631STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties' respective counsels that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, against the defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) (A)(ii). U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement terminated. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/16/2018) (rj) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-02-0832NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jameel Jaffer on behalf of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. New Address: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, 475 Riverside Drive, Suite 302, New York, NY, USA 10115, 646-745-8500. (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-1233ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference in this matter on February 23, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. The parties (and/or counsel) should appear in person in Courtroom 1306 at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY, on the date and time specified above. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 2/23/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1306, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/12/2018) (rj) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-1534NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Newby Crump on behalf of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1635MOTION for Megan Kathleen Graham to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14712008. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham, Megan) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-16>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 35 MOTION for Megan Kathleen Graham to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14712008. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-2036ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 35 Motion for Megan Kathleen Graham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/20/2018) (rj) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2037LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Megan Graham dated 2/20/2018 re: Request to Appear Telephonically at Status Conference. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Graham, Megan) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-2338MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 37 Letter regarding Request to Appear Telephonically at Status Conference filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/21/2018) (rj) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-23Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status Conference held on 2/23/2018. Jameel Jaffer, Carrie Decell, Alex Abdo, Catherine Crump and Megan Graham for Plaintiff(s). Jennifer Bain for Defendant(s). See Docket No. 39 for complete details. (Court Reporter: Steven Griffing) (tdh) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-2639ORDER: As discussed during the February 23, 2018 status conference in this matter, Defendants will complete their searches for responsive documents by March 30, 2018. Defendant U.S. Customs and Border Protection will complete document production by March 30, 2018. The parties shall submit a joint status report by April 9, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/23/2018) (rj) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-03-1240FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. Related document: 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Letter With Written Consent to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(2), # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Crump, Catherine) Modified on 3/13/2018 (sj). (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-1241EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: 40 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-13***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Catherine Newby Crump to RE-FILE re: Document No. 40 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; (U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement was previously terminated and must be added back to the docket). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-1442AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. Related document: 1 Complaint,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-1443REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 42 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-1544ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (sj) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-1545NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Catherine Newby Crump on behalf of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. New Address: Samuelson Law, Technology & Public Policy Clinic, U.C. Berkeley School of Law, 433 Boalt Hall (North Addition), Berkeley, CA, United States 94720, 510-642-5049. (Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-2246AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 3/19/2018, answer due 4/9/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Delivery Confirmation)(Graham, Megan) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-0347ANSWER to 42 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-0948STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-1349MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 48 Status Report filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed briefing schedule is adopted. A status conference is scheduled for May 14, 2018 at 10:00 am. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 5/14/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/13/2018) (rj) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-1350LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated April 13, 2018 re: Joint Status Update re ICE. Document filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-1651MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 50 Letter regarding Joint Status Update re ICE filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/16/2018) (rj) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-2052LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated April 20, 2018 re: Processing and Production Schedule for State and ICE. Document filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2053OATH of Eric F. Stein in Support of State Processing Rates . Document filed by U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2054OATH of Catrina Pavlik-Keenan in Support of ICE Production Rates . Document filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-05-0455LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Megan Graham dated May 4, 2018 re: Processing and Production Schedule for State and ICE. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Graham, Megan) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0456OATH of Carrie DeCell in Support of the Knight Institute's Letter [ECF 55] . Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Graham, Megan) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-1457ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendants U.S. Department of State and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement shall confer regarding processing and production rates in this case and shall submit a joint status report by May 21, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/14/2018) (anc) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-1458LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Carrie DeCell dated 05/14/2018 re: New Information and Proposed DOS Processing Schedule. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Decell, Caroline) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Status Conference held on 5/14/2018. Megan Graham and Carrie Decell for Plaintiff(s).Jennifer Bain for Defendant(s). See Docket No. 57. (Court Reporter: Andrew Walker) (tdh) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-1559LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated May 15, 2018 re: Plaintiffs' Letter Dated May 14, 2018. Document filed by U.S. Department of State.(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-1560ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter dated May 14, 2018. (ECF No. 58.) Defendant U.S. Department of State shall respond stating its position by May 16, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/15/2018) (ap) Modified on 5/16/2018 (ap). (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-1861ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant U.S. Department of State's ("DOS") response to Plaintiff' s letter dated May 14, 2018. ECF No. 59. In its letter, DOS stated that it could determine the precise number of responsive pages to Plaintiff's FOIA request by May 17, 2018. Id. DOS is ordered to file a status report providing the number of responsive pages by 3:00 p.m. today. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/18/2018) (rj) Modified on 5/18/2018 (rj). (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1862LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated May 18, 2018 re: State's Number of Pages to Process. Document filed by U.S. Department of State.(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1863ORDER: Accordingly, Plaintiff sought production of all such documents by June 15, 2018. Id. DOS filed a response the following day indicating that it could identify the precise number of responsive pages by May 17, 2018. ECF No. 59. Following an Order by this Court, on May 18, 2018 DOS filed a letter stating that 72 documents, totaling 1,719 pages, are most likely responsive to Plaintiff's request. ECF No. 62. DOS reiterated its request for a schedule of 300 pages per month. ECF No. 62. Having considered the respective parties' proposals and the various arguments made, the Court hereby ORDERS Defendant DOS to complete its processing and production of all responsive documents no later than June 28, 2018. Furthermore, DOS should produce those documents that they identify as responsive to Plaintiff's request on a rolling basis. The Court determines that this schedule provides a reasonable time frame for DOS to respond to, Plaintiff's request. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 6/28/2018) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/18/2018) (rj) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2164STATUS REPORT. Second Joint Status Report Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Decell, Caroline) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2365ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint status report dated May 21, 2018. ECF No. 64. Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ("ICE") shall submit a status report advising the Court how many pages of records are responsive to Plaintiff's narrowed request by June 18, 2018 or as soon as ICE completes its responsiveness review, whichever is sooner. Defendant U.S. Department of Justice-Office of Legal Counsel ("DOJ-OLC") shall submit a declaration by May 28, 2018 explaining in more detail the bases for its proposed production schedule. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/23/2018) (rjm) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-2966LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated May 29, 2018 re: OLC Production Schedule with Declaration. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Paul P. Colborn)(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-3167ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant U.S. Department of Justice-Office of Legal Counsel ("DOJ-OLC")'s declaration dated May 29, 2018. ECF No. 66. The Court hereby orders DOJ-OLC to complete its processing and production of all responsive documents no later than July 16, 2018. Furthermore, DOJ-OLC should produce those documents that they identify as responsive to Plaintiff's request on a rolling basis. The Court determines that this schedule provides a reasonable time frame for DOJ-OLC to respond to Plaintiff's request. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/31/2018) (ne) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-1868LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated June 18, 2018 re: Status Update on Behalf of ICE. Document filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-2269ORDER: In a joint status report dated May 21, 2018, Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement ("ICE") proposed to produce records responsive to Plaintiffs Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA") request on a rolling basis, to be completed by December 31, 2018. ECF No. 64. Plaintiff requested a production deadline of August 31, 2018. Id. At that time, ICE did not know how many documents were responsive to Plaintiff's narrowed request. Id. On May 23, 2018, this Court ordered ICE to submit a status report by June 18, 2018 indicating how many pages of records are responsive to Plaintiff's narrowed request. ECF No. 65. On June 18, 2018, ICE wrote to this Court stating that it has determined that 99 pages of documents are most likely responsive to the narrowed request. ECF No. 68. Plaintiff shall file a response by June 25, 2018 indicating its position on a deadline for ICE's production in light of this information. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/21/2018) (rj) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-2270LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Carrie DeCell dated June 22, 2018 re: ICE's Letter dated June 18, 2018. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Decell, Caroline) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-2671ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ("ICE") to complete its processing and production of all responsive documents no later than July 3, 2018. Furthermore, ICE should produce those documents that they identify as responsive to Plaintiff's request on a rolling basis. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 7/3/2018. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/26/2018) (rj) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-1872LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Carrie DeCell dated July 18, 2018 re: Request for Clarification of Orders Setting DOS and ICE Production Schedules. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carrie DeCell)(Decell, Caroline) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-2073LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated July 20, 2018 re: Plaintiff's July 18, 2018 Letter. Document filed by U.S. Department of State, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-2474ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter dated July 18, 2018 (ECF No. 72) and Defendants' response dated July 20, 2018 (ECF No. 73). Defendant United States Department of State ("DOS") shall produce all responsive documents by July 31, 2018. Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement ("ICE") shall make a further submission to this Court stating how many of the referred pages are responsive to Plaintiff's narrowed request and when the review of those pages will be complete by July 25, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/24/2018) (mro) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-2475LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated July 24 2018 re: ICE July 24 Update. Document filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-2676ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement ("ICE")'s letter dated July 24, 2018 (ECF No. 75). ICE shall submit a status report informing the Court how many documents are responsive to Plaintiff's narrowed request by July 27, 2018. ICE shall also refer any such remaining responsive documents to the relevant agencies no later than July 27, 2018. The Court defers ruling on a production date for any such documents until it receives ICE's status report. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/26/2018) (rj) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-2777LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from AUSA Ellen Blain dated July 27, 2018 re: Further ICE Update. Document filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Blain, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-10-0578LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from the Knight Institute dated 10/05/2018 re: Status Update. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Graham, Megan) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-11-0979LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Carrie DeCell dated November 9, 2018 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Decell, Caroline) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar