Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWESTERN VALUES PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02070
Date Filed2017-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffWESTERN VALUES PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Western Values Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning Lolita Zinke's work for the agency since March 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Western Values Project submitted a second FOIA request for records referenced in its first request that were sent or received by six named individuals. The agency acknowledged Western Values Project's second FOIA request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Western Values Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-051COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5146089) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-05Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/10/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/9/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 10/10/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/10/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-11-095ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-13MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before December 11, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/13/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-12-116STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-12MINUTE ORDER. Defendant shall submit an updated status report by January 19, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/12/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's updated status report due by 1/19/2018. (tg) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2018-01-187STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-19MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit an updated status report by March 9, 2018, which should include a proposed briefing schedule if necessary. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/19/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-03-098Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Department of the Interior and by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-12MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer and file another joint status report by April 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/12/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff