Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02076
Date Filed2017-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Competitive Enterprise Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning a pseudonymous email address used by former Attorney General Loretta Lynch. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CEI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20530
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-051COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5147135) filed by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for the U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons for the agency, the Justice Department, # 4 Summons for the Attorney General)(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-06Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-062SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-123Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-134NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-135NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. Attorney Hans Frank Bader terminated. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-136NOTICE of Appearance by Sam Kazman on behalf of COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE (Kazman, Sam) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff