Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02079
Date Filed2017-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Information Policy for records concerning funding of Robert Mueller's investigation of Russian interference in the 2016 election. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5147680) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Justice)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-06Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/16/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/16/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-11-155NOTICE of Appearance by Antonia Marie Konkoly on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-156ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly propose a briefing schedule by November 30, 2017. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/16/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/30/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-297Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall provide an interim response to Plaintiffs FOIA request on or before January 19, 2018; (2) Defendant shall provide a final response to Plaintiffs FOIA request on or before March 16, 2018; and (3) The parties shall meet and confer following the final response to determine if dispositive motions are necessary. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before March 30, 2018, proposing a schedule for dispositive motions, if necessary. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/30/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 1/19/2018. Final Responses due by 3/16/2018. Status Report due by 3/30/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff