Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMUSLIM ADVOCATES et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02080
Date Filed2017-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffMUSLIM ADVOCATES
PlaintiffAMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE
PlaintiffSOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER
Case DescriptionMuslim Advocates, Americans United for Separation of Church and State, and the Southern Poverty Law Center submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State, Department of Homeland Security, and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the waiver provision of the revised travel ban. All three agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The State Department granted the requesters' request for a fee waiver, but denied their request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Muslim Advocates, Americans United for Separation of Church and State, and the Southern Poverty Law Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
2201 C Street NW
Washington, DC 20520
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
3801 NEBRASKA AVENUE NW
WASHINGTON, DC 20016
DefendantCUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantCUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
1300 PENNSYLVANIA AVENUE NW
WASHINGTON, DC 20004
DefendantUNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-051COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by MUSLIM ADVOCATES, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons DEPT OF STATE, # 7 Summons DEPT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, # 8 Summons CUSTOM AND BOARDER PROTECTION, # 9 Summons DOJ, # 10 Summons US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE)(Weiner, David) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-052Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH, MUSLIM ADVOCATES, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER. (Weiner, David) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-06Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-063SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-11-274NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Katskee on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Katskee, Richard) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-12-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 11/28/2017; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/28/2017; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/28/2017. (Weiner, David) Modified on 12/4/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/28/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/28/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/28/2017. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-227Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kishore, Deepthy) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-26MINUTE ORDER: Granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by January 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/26/17. (DJS) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2017-12-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' answer or otherwise response to the Complaint is now due by 1/26/2018. (jth) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-01-268ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Kishore, Deepthy) Modified to add link on 1/29/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-27MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiffs' FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiffs, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 2/20/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/27/18. (DJS) (Entered: 01/27/2018)
2018-01-28Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a Joint Status Report that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order by 2/20/18. (jth) (Entered: 01/28/2018)
2018-01-299NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-0210NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathan James Smith on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE, MUSLIM ADVOCATES, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER. (Weiner, David) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-26MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another report by April 15, 2018. The parties are reminded that all reports shall be accompanied by a proposed order, unless the court enters an order to the contrary. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/26/18. (DJS) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/15/2018. (tb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-04-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kishore, Deepthy) (Entered: 04/15/2018)
2018-04-20MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 12 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint status report and proposed order by June 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/20/18. (DJS) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and proposed order due by 6/3/2018.(tb) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-06-0313STATUS REPORT Third Joint Report by AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE, MUSLIM ADVOCATES, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER. (Weiner, David) (Entered: 06/03/2018)
2018-07-1114NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Dena Michal Roth on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Deepthy Kishore (Roth, Dena) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-08-1415Joint STATUS REPORT (Fourth) by UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Roth, Dena) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 15 , a Status Conference is hereby set for 10/5/18 at 2:30 pm in Courtroom 9. The parties shall file another joint report by 9/28/18, along with a PROPOSED ORDER. At that time, if both parties agree that the status conference is unnecessary, the court will cancel the conference. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/17/18. (DJS) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/28/2018. Status Conference set for 10/5/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-2016NOTICE of Change of Address by Johnathan James Smith (Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-2017NOTICE of Change of Address by Sirine Shebaya (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-09-2718NOTICE of Change of Address by Dena Michal Roth (Roth, Dena) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-2819Joint STATUS REPORT (Fifth) by UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Dena) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-03MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 19 , it is hereby ordered that the status conference previously set for October 5, 2018 is hereby VACATED. The parties shall file another joint status report and proposed order by October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/3/18. (DJS) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-2620Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE, MUSLIM ADVOCATES, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiner, David) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-29MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 20 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by 11/29/18 and every 60 days thereafter. To the extent the parties propose a briefing schedule, the report shall include a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/29/18. (DJS) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar