Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02085
Date Filed2017-10-06
Date Closed2017-12-29
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between former Attorney General Loretta Lynch and either Rep. Debbie Wasserman-Schultz or Clinton campaign aide Amanda Renteria pertaining to Clinton's use of a private email server. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5149474) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Justice)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-062LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (md) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-104STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 10, 2017.(lcbah2) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/16/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/16/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-11-156ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Takemoto, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-297Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, that the parties, by January 5, 2018, file a joint status report with a proposed schedule for any future proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 29, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2018. (tg) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-118STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-28MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISMISSING this matter without prejudice in light of the plaintiff's 8 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 28, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff