Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02093
Date Filed2017-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning Secretary Ben Carson and his activities, records referencing Fred Trump III, and records concerning the agency's FOIA policies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency told American Oversight that because its outside contractor did not have access to certain categories of records it could not search for records on Fred Trump until at least February 2018. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5151522) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons HUD)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-10Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (jd) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/19/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/18/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 10/18/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-10-275NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-276NOTICE of Appearance by Cerissa Cafasso on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-11-207ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(Walker, Johnny) Modified to add link on 11/21/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-20MINUTE ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before December 11, 2017. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/20/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-12-118Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before February 9, 2018, that updates the court on their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/12/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-12Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/9/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2018-02-099Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before April 10, 2018, that updates the court on their progress regarding search and production and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/9/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-09Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/10/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-04-1010Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another Joint Status Report, on or before June 11, 2018, that updates the court on their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/10/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-10Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-06-1111Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before July 2, 2018, that updates the court on their progress. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/12/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-0212Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit a Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-03MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 12 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. The Joint Status Report previously due on July 2, 2018, is now due on or before July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/3/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-1213Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-13MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before September 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/13/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-09-0714Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-10MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/10/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar