Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02098
Date Filed2017-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Special Counsel for records filed since January 2017 alleging violations of the Hatch Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-101COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5152514) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-12Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-11-104RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/16/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL served on 10/16/2017 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/10/2017)
2017-11-155NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bryce on behalf of OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-156ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL.(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-15MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. Since the requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not apply, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by December 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/15/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/6/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-12-047Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Schedule by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-06MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule by January 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/6/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/5/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2018-01-048Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Schedule by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-05MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall now submit a joint proposed schedule by January 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/5/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-05MINUTE ORDER: Local Civil Rule 5.1(c)(1) requires that "[t]he first filing by or on behalf of a party shall have in the caption the name and full residence address of the party." Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a corrected version of their complaint by January 19, 2018 that complies with that Rule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/5/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/26/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-059Corrected COMPLAINT (First) against OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Light, Jeffrey) Modified per counsel on 1/18/2018 (td). (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-2910Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-30MINUTE ORDER: In light of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, the schedule for production in this case shall be as follows: Defendant shall make rolling productions of responsive records by the last business day of each month. The parties shall file a status report on the last business day of every other month, commencing March 30, 2018 through May 31, 2019, updating the Court on the status of production. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/30/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-03-3011Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-05-3112Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-07-3113Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-09-2814Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-11-3015Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-2616Consent MOTION to Stay Schedule In Light of Lapse of Appropriations by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-27MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Motion to Stay. All deadlines shall be stayed pending renewed funding. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/27/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-01-2817NOTICE of Restoration of Appropriations by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of 17 Notice of Restoration of Appropriations, the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before February 4, 2019, which shall include a proposed schedule for future proceedings. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/1/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-0118Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 18 joint status report, the parties shall file joint status reports on or before February 28, April 30, and June 28, 2019, updating the Court on the status of production. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/1/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/4/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2019, 4/30/2019 and 6/28/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-2819Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-04-3020Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-01MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file an updated joint status report on or before June 28, 2019. In that report, the parties shall indicate whether any issues remain to be litigated and, if so, propose a summary judgment briefing schedule commencing no more than 30 days after the report. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/1/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/28/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar