Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWP COMPANY LLC v. SPECIAL INSPECTOR GENERAL OF AFGHANISTAN RECONSTRUCTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02114
Date Filed2017-10-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffWP COMPANY LLC d/b/a THE WASHINGTON POST
Case DescriptionWashington Post reporters Greg Miller and Craig Whitlock submitted a FOIA request to the Special Inspector General for Afghanistan Reconstruction for records concerning interviews the agency conducted with former Lt. Gen. Michael Flynn. The Post also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency denied the Post's request in full. The Post filed an administrative appeal. In response to the Post's administrative appeal, the agency indicated that it was remanding the request for further processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Post filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantSPECIAL INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR AFGHANISTAN RECONSTRUCTION
DefendantSPECIAL INSPECTOR GENERAL OF AFGHANISTAN RECONSTRUCTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-121COMPLAINT against SPECIAL INSPECTOR GENERAL OF AFGHANISTAN RECONSTRUCTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5156322) filed by WP COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Summons - Special Inspector General of Afghanistan Reconstruction, # 7 Summons Summons - Jeff Sessions, # 8 Summons Summons - Jessie K. Liu)(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-122Corporate Disclosure Statement by WP COMPANY LLC. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-12Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SPECIAL INSPECTOR GENERAL OF AFGHANISTAN RECONSTRUCTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/13/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2017. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/13/2017. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SPECIAL INSPECTOR GENERAL OF AFGHANISTAN RECONSTRUCTION served on 10/13/2017 (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-11-137ANSWER to Complaint by SPECIAL INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR AFGHANISTAN RECONSTRUCTION.(Siple, Adam) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-14MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before December 12, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/14/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff