Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReyes v. U.S. Dept. of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs, et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv02120
Date Filed2017-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John A. Houston
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionResearcher Emilio Reyes submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Indian Affairs for records concerning California Indians identified in several different censuses. BIA denied Reyes' first request and redacted 25 pages in response to his second request. Reyes filed an administrative appeal to the agency, which was denied. Reyes then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Dept. of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs
DefendantU.S. Dept. of Interior, Office of the Solicitor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [11]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-161COMPLAINT against U.S. Dept. of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs; U.S. Dept. of Interior, Office of the Solicitor, IFP Filed, filed by Emilio Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-2120-MMA-JMA. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Reyes, Emilio)(rmc) (jao). (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-162MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (rmc) (jao). (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-253ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for all further proceedings. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:17-cv-01190-JAH-RBB. The new case number is 17-cv-2120-JAH-RBB. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/23/2017. Signed by Judge John Houston on 10/20/2017. Motions set before Ruben B. Brooks.(ag) Modified on 10/25/2017 to note that all non registered users were mailed a copy of this order (ag). (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-11-064ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. (summons and ifp package prepared). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/02/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-065Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: # 1 in forma pauperis letter)(jpp) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-12-126SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emilio Reyes. U.S. Attorney Office served. (jpp) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-127SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emilio Reyes. U.S. Dept. of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs served. (jpp) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-278SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emilio Reyes. Office of the Attorney General served. (jpp) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2017-12-279SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emilio Reyes. U.S. Dept. of Interior, Office of the Solicitor served. (jpp) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-0410ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Dept. of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs, U.S. Dept. of Interior, Office of the Solicitor. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party U.S. Dept. of Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party U.S. Dept. of Interior, Office of the Solicitor(pty:dft) (jpp). (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-0911NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/7/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/09/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-02-0812Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 2/8/2018. Settlement Conference set for 5/16/2018 at 1:30pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 2/08/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-0813SCHEDULING ORDER regulating discovery and other pre-trial proceedings. Settlement Conference set for 5/16/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/17/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 2/08/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-03-2214MINUTE ORDER - Due to a conflict on the Courts calendar, the Court resets the settlement conference currently scheduled for May 16, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. to June 27, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. The parties shall submit a joint settlement status report directly to chambers by June 20, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 3/22/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff