Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBuzzfeed, Inc. v. Department Of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv07949
Date Filed2017-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vernon S. Broderick
PlaintiffBuzzfeed, Inc.
Case DescriptionBuzzfeed reporter Zoe Tillerman submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Justice for records concerning the finding of misconduct by a former U.S. Attorney, the existence of which had been posted on the agency's website. The agency provided a copy of the report with redactions under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Tillerman filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency upheld its denial. Tillerman and Buzzfeed then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-161COMPLAINT against Department Of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14248968)Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Request, # 2 Exhibit Finding of Misconduct, # 3 Exhibit Determination, # 4 Exhibit Appeal, # 5 Exhibit Affirming Determination)(Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-162CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-163FILING ERROR NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate NBCUniversal Media LLC for Buzzfeed, Inc.. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc..(Syed, Nabiha) Modified on 10/17/2017 (lb). (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-164REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-165NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Lynn Schafer on behalf of Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-17***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Nabiha Syed to RE-FILE Document 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-17***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nabiha Syed. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Department Of Justice. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (kl) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-17CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (kl) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-17Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (kl) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-17Case Designated ECF. (kl) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-176ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Justice. (kl) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-177RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Comcast Corporation, Other Affiliate NBCUniversal Media LLC for Buzzfeed, Inc.. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc..(Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-188SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). U.S. Department of Justice served on 10/17/2017, answer due 11/16/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-11-169ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice.(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2018-01-2310ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/8/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/23/2018) (kgo) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-3011JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Nabiha Syed dated January 30, 2018 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc..(Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-3112MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 11 Letter filed by Buzzfeed, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. The initial pre-trial conference scheduled for February 8, 2018 is adjourned. The parties' request for a briefing schedule for their cross-motions for summary judgment as set forth in paragraph 3 of the parties' January 30, 2018 letter, (Doc. 11), is GRANTED. (Cross Motions due by 4/11/2018. Motions due by 3/12/2018. Responses due by 5/11/2018. Replies due by 5/11/2018.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/31/2018) (ras) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-03-0713LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Arastu K. Chaudhury dated March 7, 2018. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-0814ORDER granting 13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: APPLICATION GRANTED. The Government's request for an extension of time regarding the parties' briefing schedule for their cross-motions for summary judgment as set forth herein is GRANTED. (Cross Motions due by 4/20/2018. Motions due by 3/21/2018.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/8/2018) (jwh) Modified on 5/7/2018 (jwh). (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/18/2018 Replies due by 6/1/2018. (jwh) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-2115MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice.(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-2116MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-2117DECLARATION of Deborah M. Waller in Support re: 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-04-2018CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. Responses due by 5/18/2018(Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2020FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Syed, Nabiha) Modified on 4/24/2018 (db). (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2021DECLARATION of Matthew L. Schafer in Support re: 18 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2022DECLARATION of Zoe Tillman in Support re: 18 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-24***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Nabiha Syed to RE-FILE Document 20 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Rule 56.1 Statement is filed separately, receiving its own document #. Only refile the Rule 56.1 Statement using the Event found under - Other Answers. (db) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-2423RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-1824REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion . Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1825RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-06-0126REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar