Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02140
Date Filed2017-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Environmental Integrity Project submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning Administrator Scott Pruitt's meetings with outside parties and his travel vouchers. EIP submitted a second FOIA request for records concerning travel expenses for agency staff who accompanied Pruitt on out of town trips. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EIP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-171COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5162774) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons U.S. Attorney for DC, # 8 Summons U.S. EPA, # 9 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-172Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-11-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/24/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 USPS Electronic Confirmation)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 USPS Electronic Confirmation)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 10/23/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 USPS Electronic Confirmation)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff